AK HB250 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD
Pending: House Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD
Pending: House Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act interpreting the right to privacy under art. I, sec. 22, Constitution of the State of Alaska; relating to the description of a natural person; defining 'conception' and 'preborn child'; relating to civil actions and liability under the Act; repealing limitations on the applicability of laws criminalizing the murder or assault of an unborn child; repealing abortion procedures; relating to crimes involving multiple deaths; changing provisions of certain crimes involving murder, manslaughter, homicide, and assault to refer to preborn children and relating to the penalties and other provisions relating to those crimes; relating to the powers of guardians; relating to powers of attorney for health care decisions; relating to regulation of abortion; relating to medical treatment for minors; relating to the office of public advocacy; repealing medical assistance payment for abortions; relating to court jurisdiction; replacing the term 'unborn' with 'preborn' in certain instances; amending Rule 404(a), Alaska Rules of Appellate Procedure; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Abortion Offenses; Privacy Rights; Judges
Sponsors
Rep. David Eastman [R] | Rep. DeLena Johnson [R] | Rep. George Rauscher [R] | Rep. Colleen Sullivan-Leonard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2018-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2017-06-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2017-05-15 | House | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES |
2017-05-15 | House | HSS, STA, JUD, FIN |
2017-05-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB250 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0250A.PDF |