AK HB244 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Citizens' Advisory Commission on Federal Management Areas in Alaska; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Advisory Commission On Federal Mgt Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14 |
2014-06-20 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 40 SLA 14 |
2014-06-12 | House | 3:27 PM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 A5 |
2014-04-18 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-13 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-13 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-12 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 244(FIN) |
2014-04-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-12 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-12 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 244(FIN) |
2014-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-12 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | FN1: (DNR) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-03-21 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY |
2014-03-21 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2014-02-26 | Senate | FIN |
2014-02-26 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-24 | House | VERSION: HB 244 |
2014-02-24 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2014-02-24 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-02-24 | House | PASSED Y34 N1 E4 V1 |
2014-02-24 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 244 |
2014-02-24 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-24 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N29 E4 V1 |
2014-02-24 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-24 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2014-02-14 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2014-02-14 | House | NR: GARA, AUSTERMAN |
2014-02-14 | House | DNP: GUTTENBERG |
2014-02-14 | House | DP: T.WILSON, HOLMES, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, MUNOZ, COSTELLO, STOLTZE |
2014-02-14 | House | FIN RPT 8DP 1DNP 2NR |
2014-02-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON |
2014-02-05 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2014-02-05 | House | NR: KAWASAKI, TARR |
2014-02-05 | House | DP: JOHNSON, HAWKER, P.WILSON, SEATON, SADDLER, FEIGE |
2014-02-05 | House | RES RPT 6DP 2NR |
2014-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, P.WILSON |
2014-01-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2014-01-21 | House | RES, FIN |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |