AK HB236 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to education; increasing the base student allocation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Increase Base Student Allocation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-09 | House | FN2: (EED/FUND CAP) |
2020-03-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2020-03-09 | House | NR: JOHNSON |
2020-03-09 | House | DNP: PRAX |
2020-03-09 | House | DP: ZULKOSKY, TUCK, STORY, DRUMMOND |
2020-03-09 | House | EDC RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR |
2020-02-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, JOSEPHSON, ZULKOSKY, HOPKINS, CLAMAN |
2020-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2020-02-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2020-02-05 | House | EDC, FIN |
2020-02-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB236 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0236A.PDF |