AK HB236 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/8/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act extending the Alaska senior benefits payment program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend: Senior Benefits Payment Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/8/18
2018-05-12HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 5/10 CHAPTER 8 SLA 18
2018-05-07House9:37 AM 5/7/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-17SenateVERSION: CSHB 236(FIN)
2018-04-17SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-14SenatePASSED Y19 N- A1
2018-04-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 236(FIN)
2018-04-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-14SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018
2018-04-13SenateFN3: (S.FIN/DHS)
2018-04-13SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-04-13SenateFIN RPT 7DP
2018-02-09SenateSTEDMAN, HUGHES, EGAN, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, WILSON, OLSON, MEYER, MACKINNON
2018-02-09SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, KELLY, GIESSEL, STEVENS, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, COSTELLO
2018-02-09SenateFIN
2018-02-09SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-02-07HouseVERSION: CSHB 236(FIN)
2018-02-07HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-02-07HouseWOOL, LINCOLN, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON
2018-02-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, GARA, GRENN, GUTTENBERG, PARISH, TARR, MILLETT, SEATON
2018-02-07HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N1 E4
2018-02-07HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2018-02-07HouseMILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-02-07HousePASSED Y35 N1 E4
2018-02-07HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 236(FIN)
2018-02-07HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-02-07HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-02-07HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-07HouseRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 2/7/2018
2018-02-07HouseFN2: (DHS)
2018-02-07HouseSEATON
2018-02-07HouseDP: TILTON, GRENN, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, KAWASAKI, GARA, WILSON, FOSTER,
2018-02-07HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP
2018-02-07HouseFN1: (DHS)
2018-02-07HouseAM: EASTMAN
2018-02-07HouseDP: JOHNSTON, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ
2018-02-07HouseHSS RPT 4DP 1AM
2018-01-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2018-01-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2017-04-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-04-17HouseHSS, FIN
2017-04-17HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback