AK HB236 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, HUGHES, SADDLER
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, HUGHES, SADDLER
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to marriage solemnization.
Title
Right To Refuse To Solemnize Marriage
Sponsors
Rep. David Talerico [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Sen. Lora Reinbold [R] | Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] |
Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] | Rep. Dan Saddler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, HUGHES, SADDLER |
2016-04-04 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-04-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2016-04-04 | House | AM: CLAMAN, FOSTER |
2016-04-04 | House | NR: KREISS-TOMKINS |
2016-04-04 | House | DP: KELLER, MILLETT, LYNN, LEDOUX |
2016-04-04 | House | JUD RPT 4DP 1NR 2AM |
2016-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2016-01-19 | House | JUD |
2016-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-01-19 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/16 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=29&bill=HB236 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0236A.PDF |