AK HB234 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - RETURN TO GOVERNOR 5/20/20 FOR PERMANENT FILING
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act making supplemental appropriations and other appropriations; amending appropriations; capitalizing funds; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approp:supp; Reapprop; Cap; Amend; Cbr

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-25 - House - House: Constitutional Budget Reserve Appropriations Concur (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - House - House: Rescind (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - House - House: Rescind (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Effective Date Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Divide the Question Constitutional Budget Reserve Appropriations Concur (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Divide the Question Constitutional Budget Reserve Appropriations Concur (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Constitutional Budget Reserve Section (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Constitutional Budget Reserve Appropriations (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseRETURN TO GOVERNOR 5/20/20 FOR PERMANENT FILING
2020-05-18HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2020-05-18HousePARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS
2020-05-18HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 4/6 CHAPTER 7 SLA 20
2020-05-18HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2020-05-18House4:45 P.M. 3/31/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2020-03-25HouseVERSION: SCS CSHB 234(FIN)(BRF SUP MAJ FLD)
2020-03-25HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-25House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2020-03-25HouseCBRF SECTION(S) (FLD) Y27 N11 E2
2020-03-25HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E2
2020-03-25HouseRESCIND ACTION PASSAGE ON CONCUR Y23 N15 E2
2020-03-18HouseVERSION: SCS CSHB 234(FIN)(BRF SUP MAJ FLD)
2020-03-18HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 E2
2020-03-18House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2020-03-18HouseCBRF SECTION(S) (FLD) Y28 N10 E2
2020-03-18HouseMOTION TO DIVIDE QUESTION (FLD) Y15 N23 E2
2020-03-18HouseMOTION TO (ADP/FLD) CBRF SECTION(S)
2020-03-18HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y28 N10 E2
2020-03-18HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2020-03-18HouseWAIVE UNIFORM RULE 41(C)
2020-03-18HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 13
2020-03-18HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2020-03-18SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 234(FIN)
2020-03-18SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2020-03-18SenateCBRF SECTION(S) ADOPTED Y16 N- E4
2020-03-18SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-18SenatePASSED Y16 N- E4
2020-03-18SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 234(FIN)
2020-03-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2020-03-18SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2020-03-18SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-18SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2020
2020-03-18SenateNR: WILSON
2020-03-18SenateDP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, BISHOP
2020-03-18SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 13
2020-03-18SenateFIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2020-02-28SenateFIN
2020-02-28SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-02-26HouseVERSION: CSHB 234(FIN)
2020-02-26HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-02-26HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-02-26HouseCBRF SECTION(S) (ADP) Y35 N2 E3
2020-02-26HousePASSED Y35 N2 E3
2020-02-26HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 234(FIN)
2020-02-26HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2020-02-26 1706
2020-02-26 1705
2020-02-26HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2020-02-26HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-02-26HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2020
2020-02-26HouseAM: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2020-02-26HouseDP: ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER, JOHNSTON
2020-02-26HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 4AM
2020-02-05HouseGOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
2020-02-05HouseFIN
2020-02-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB234
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0234A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0234B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0234C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/A/HB0234-H001.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0234D.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0234Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB234&Page=01708#1708
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB234&Page=01709#1709
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=HB234&Page=02100#2100
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB234&Page=01937#1937
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB234&Page=01938#1938
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB234&Page=01939#1939
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB234&Page=02085#2085
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB234&Page=02086#2086
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB234&Page=02087#2087

Bill Comments

feedback