AK HB234 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurance coverage for mental health benefits provided through telehealth.
Title
Insurance Coverage For Telemedicine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/16 |
2016-06-14 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 17 SLA 16 |
2016-05-27 | House | 4:36 PM 5/26/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2016-04-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N3 E1 A2 |
2016-04-17 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2016-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 234(L&C) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2016-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 234(L&C) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | L&C SCS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16 |
2016-04-16 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2016-04-16 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER, STEVENS |
2016-04-16 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 26 |
2016-04-16 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2016-04-14 | Senate | L&C |
2016-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 234(L&C) |
2016-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-04-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, KITO, LEDOUX |
2016-04-13 | House | PASSED Y38 N1 E1 |
2016-04-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 234(L&C) |
2016-04-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-13 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | COSPONSOR: REMOVED: TILTON |
2016-04-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2016-04-12 | House | NR: LEDOUX, KITO, JOSEPHSON |
2016-04-12 | House | DP: TILTON, HUGHES, OLSON |
2016-04-12 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 3DP 3NR |
2016-04-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2016-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TALERICO, EDGMON, MUNOZ |
2016-03-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2016-03-18 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2016-03-18 | House | AM: SEATON |
2016-03-18 | House | NR: TALERICO |
2016-03-18 | House | DP: TARR, VAZQUEZ, WOOL |
2016-03-18 | House | HSS RPT 3DP 1NR 1AM |
2016-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2016-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK |
2016-01-19 | House | HSS, L&C |
2016-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-01-19 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/16 |