AK HB230 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the limit on the number of years of out-of-state school experience that may be substituted for in-state experience in teacher salary scales.
Title
Out-of-state Tchg Experience & Salaries
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Himschoot [I] | Rep. Daniel Ortiz [I] | Rep. Maxine Dibert [D] | Rep. Sara Hannan [D] |
Rep. William Fields [D] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2024-04-05 | House | AM: ALLARD |
2024-04-05 | House | DP: STORY, HIMSCHOOT, MCKAY, MCCORMICK, PRAX, RUFFRIDGE |
2024-04-05 | House | EDC RPT 6DP 1AM |
2024-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2024-02-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2024-01-16 | House | EDC |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/24 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB230 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0230A.PDF |