AK HB229 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska higher education investment trust fund; and relating to the Alaska Student Loan Corporation.
Title
Alaska Higher Education Investment Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] | Rep. Calvin Schrage [N] |
Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Adam Wool [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair - Amendment No. 2 not germane (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair - Amendment No. 2 not germane (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2022-04-19 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2022-04-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 229(EDC) |
2022-04-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-04-14 | House | PASSED Y23 N9 E8 |
2022-04-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 229(EDC) |
2022-04-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WOOL, SPOHNHOLZ |
2022-04-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR |
2022-04-13 | House | SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y19 N12 E8 A1 |
2022-04-13 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED AND RULED OUT OF ORDER |
2022-04-13 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2022-04-13 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-04-13 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2022-04-13 | House | EDC CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | FN3: (EED) |
2022-04-05 | House | FN2: (GOV/FUND CAP) |
2022-04-05 | House | NR: LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, RASMUSSEN |
2022-04-05 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2022-04-05 | House | FIN RPT CS(EDC) NEW TITLE 6DP 4NR |
2022-03-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2022-02-14 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2022-02-14 | House | NR: CRONK, PRAX |
2022-02-14 | House | DNP: GILLHAM |
2022-02-14 | House | DP: ZULKOSKY, HOPKINS, DRUMMOND, STORY |
2022-02-14 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) NEW TITLE 4DP 1DNP 2NR |
2022-01-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY, SCHRAGE |
2022-01-18 | House | EDC, FIN |
2022-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/22 |
Subjects
Appropriations
Corporations
Education
Funds
Grants
Investments
Loans
Public Corporations
Public Finance
Universities
Corporations
Education
Funds
Grants
Investments
Loans
Public Corporations
Public Finance
Universities