AK HB229 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a bond or cash deposit required for an oil or gas business; relating to claims against an oil and gas business; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Oil & Gas Business Bond
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Seaton [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2017-05-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-05-01 | House | VERSION: HB 229 |
2017-05-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-05-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-05-01 | House | PASSED Y30 N10 |
2017-05-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 229 |
2017-04-28 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR |
2017-04-28 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-28 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2017 |
2017-04-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-04-27 | House | NR: BIRCH |
2017-04-27 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2017-04-27 | House | L&C RPT 5DP 1NR |
2017-04-14 | House | L&C |
2017-04-14 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |