AK HB221 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for state recognition of federally recognized tribes; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Recognition Of Tribes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2020-03-18SenateSTA, CRA
2020-03-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-03-17HouseVERSION: CSHB 221(TRB)
2020-03-17HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-03-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-17HousePASSED Y31 N5 E3 A1
2020-03-17HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
2020-03-16HouseHELD TO 3/17 CALENDAR
2020-03-13HouseADJOURNED TO 3/16 CALENDAR
2020-03-13HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 221(TRB) & PENDING
2020-03-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, DRUMMOND
2020-03-11HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/13 CALENDAR
2020-03-11HouseTRB CS ADOPTED UC
2020-03-11HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-11HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2020
2020-03-03HouseFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2020-03-03HouseNR: THOMPSON
2020-03-03HouseDP: CLAMAN, DRUMMOND, HANNAN
2020-03-03HouseCRA RPT CS(TRB) 3DP 1NR
2020-02-19HouseFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2020-02-19HouseAM: TALERICO
2020-02-19HouseNR: VANCE
2020-02-19HouseDP: KOPP, LINCOLN, EDGMON, ZULKOSKY
2020-02-19HouseTRB RPT CS(TRB) 4DP 1NR 1AM
2020-01-27HouseTRB, CRA
2020-01-27HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback