AK HB221 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the duties of the Alaska Commission on Postsecondary Education; relating to a statewide workforce and education-related statistics program; relating to information obtained by the Department of Labor and Workforce Development; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Workforce & Ed Related Statistics Program
Sponsors
Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Sen. Alberta Gardner [D] | Sen. Gary Stevens [R] |
Sen. Click Bishop [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/18 |
2018-06-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 32 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | 3:05 PM 6/13/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-01 | Senate | VERSION: HB 221 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-01 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, STEVENS, BISHOP |
2018-05-01 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-01 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-05-01 | Senate | HUGHES MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING |
2018-05-01 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 221 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-01 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-01 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2018 |
2018-04-20 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-04-20 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2018-04-20 | Senate | NR: COGHILL, GIESSEL, HUGHES |
2018-04-20 | Senate | DP: STEVENS |
2018-04-20 | Senate | EDC RPT 1DP 3NR |
2018-04-17 | Senate | EDC |
2018-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-15 | House | VERSION: HB 221 |
2018-04-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-15 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2018-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2018-04-14 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-04-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-14 | House | PASSED Y36 N4 |
2018-04-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 221 |
2018-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | FN2: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2018-04-11 | House | NR: WILSON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, TILTON |
2018-04-11 | House | DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, FOSTER |
2018-04-11 | House | FIN RPT 4DP 5NR |
2018-03-07 | House | FN2: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-03-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2018-03-07 | House | NR: TALERICO |
2018-03-07 | House | DP: PARISH, KOPP, JOHNSTON, DRUMMOND |
2018-03-07 | House | EDC RPT 4DP 1NR |
2017-04-08 | House | EDC, FIN |
2017-04-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |