AK HB22 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to shared animal ownership; and relating to the sharing of raw milk and raw milk products.
Title
Shared Animal And Raw Milk/products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/21 |
2021-08-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/1 CHAPTER 15 SLA 21 |
2021-06-17 | House | 1:22 P.M. 6/17/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | Senate | VERSION: HB 22 AM |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | HOLLAND, BISHOP, MICCICHE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REVAK, SHOWER, GRAY-JACKSON, REINBOLD, KAWASAKI, |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 22 AM |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-19 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR UC |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | AM: KIEHL |
2021-05-18 | Senate | NR: VON IMHOF |
2021-05-18 | Senate | DP: REVAK, BISHOP, MICCICHE, STEVENS, KAWASAKI |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RES RPT SCS 5DP 1NR 1AM SAME TITLE |
2021-05-07 | Senate | RES |
2021-05-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-06 | House | VERSION: HB 22 AM |
2021-05-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE, SCHRAGE, DRUMMOND, GILLHAM |
2021-05-06 | House | PASSED Y38 N1 E1 |
2021-05-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 22 AM |
2021-05-06 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-06 | House | AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2021-05-06 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y2 N37 E1 |
2021-05-06 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2021-05-06 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-06 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2021-05-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SHAW |
2021-04-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER |
2021-04-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2021-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2021-04-21 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2021-04-21 | House | AM: RAUSCHER, GILLHAM |
2021-04-21 | House | NR: HOPKINS |
2021-04-21 | House | DP: MCKAY, FIELDS, CRONK, HANNAN, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK |
2021-04-21 | House | RES RPT 6DP 1NR 2AM |
2021-04-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2021-04-07 | House | NR: PATKOTAK |
2021-04-07 | House | DP: MCCARTY, DRUMMOND, PRAX, MCCABE, HANNAN, SCHRAGE |
2021-04-07 | House | CRA RPT 6DP 1NR |
2021-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2021-02-18 | House | CRA, RES |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |