AK HB211 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-16 - RETURNED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-16 - RETURNED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring a nonresident to be accompanied by a guide or resident spouse or relative when hunting certain caribou.
Title
Nonresident Hunting Requirements: Caribou
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2018-02-14 | House | RETURNED TO SENATE |
2018-02-14 | House | BILL REPRINTED ALL VERSIONS 2/14/18 |
2018-02-14 | House | PRIME SPONSOR: LINCOLN |
2018-02-14 | House | BILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE |
2018-02-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO HOUSE PER REQUEST |
2017-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2017-05-03 | Senate | STA, JUD, RES |
2017-05-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-28 | House | VERSION: CSHB 211(RES)(EFD FLD) |
2017-04-28 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-28 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2017-04-28 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y22 N17 E1 |
2017-04-28 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N18 E1 |
2017-04-28 | House | RESCIND ACTION ON PASSAGE UC |
2017-04-28 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2017-04-28 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y23 N16 E1 |
2017-04-28 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N18 E1 |
2017-04-28 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-27 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2017-04-27 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2017-04-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y23 N17 |
2017-04-27 | House | PASSED Y21 N19 |
2017-04-27 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | House | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/27 CALENDAR |
2017-04-24 | House | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/26 CALENDAR |
2017-04-24 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 211(RES) |
2017-04-19 | House | HELD TO 4/24 CALENDAR |
2017-04-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR |
2017-04-17 | House | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-15 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-04-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2017-04-15 | House | NR: PARISH, TALERICO, RAUSCHER, BIRCH |
2017-04-15 | House | DP: WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, TARR, JOSEPHSON |
2017-04-15 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) 4DP 4NR |
2017-04-05 | House | RES |
2017-04-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |