AK HB21 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to group insurance coverage and self-insurance coverage for school district employees, employees of the University of Alaska, and employees of other governmental units in the state; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School/university Employee Health Insur
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2023-05-03 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-03 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2023-05-03 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2023-05-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(UA) |
2023-05-03 | House | AM: RUFFRIDGE, SUMNER |
2023-05-03 | House | NR: SADDLER, PRAX, WRIGHT |
2023-05-03 | House | DNP: FIELDS, CARRICK |
2023-05-03 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 2DNP 3NR 2AM |
2023-04-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY |
2023-03-29 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2023-03-29 | House | FN1: ZERO(UA) |
2023-03-29 | House | NR: HIMSCHOOT, STORY, PRAX, RUFFRIDGE |
2023-03-29 | House | DP: MCKAY, ALLARD |
2023-03-29 | House | EDC RPT 2DP 4NR |
2023-01-27 | House | CRA REFERRAL REMOVED |
2023-01-19 | House | CRA, EDC, L&C |
2023-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-01-19 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23 |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Death
Disabilities
Education
Employment
Funds
Insurance
Labor Relations
Medical Care
Public Employees
Retirement
Salaries & Allowances
School Districts
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Death
Disabilities
Education
Employment
Funds
Insurance
Labor Relations
Medical Care
Public Employees
Retirement
Salaries & Allowances
School Districts
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB21 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0021A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0021B.PDF |