AK HB19 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to permanent motor vehicle registration in the unorganized borough and in a municipality that has elected to allow permanent registration; relating to the registration fee for noncommercial trailers and to the motor vehicle tax for trailers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Perm. Mot. Veh. Registration/trailers
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Stoltze [R] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] | Rep. Mark Neuman [R] | Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] |
Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15 |
2014-06-24 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 50 SLA 14 |
2014-06-13 | House | 2:19 PM 6/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-22 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 19(RLS)(EFD AM) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-21 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-21 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N2 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 19(RLS)(EFD AM) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-21 | Senate | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2014-04-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-20 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/20 - ON 4/21 CALENDAR |
2014-04-19 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR |
2014-04-19 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/19/14 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-04-19 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-04-19 | Senate | DP: MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY |
2014-04-19 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 1NR |
2014-03-28 | Senate | FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-03-28 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-03-28 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 1NR |
2014-03-14 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2014-03-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-12 | House | VERSION: CSHB 19(RLS)(EFD AM) |
2014-03-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-03-12 | House | PASSED Y32 N5 E2 A1 |
2014-03-12 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-12 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 19(RLS) |
2014-03-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/12 CALENDAR |
2014-03-10 | House | RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM) RECEIVED |
2014-02-24 | House | FN(S) FORTHCOMING |
2014-02-24 | House | DP: GRUENBERG, HAWKER, OLSON, CHENAULT, KELLER, HERRON, JOHNSON |
2014-02-24 | House | RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 7DP |
2013-06-24 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2013-06-24 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 65 |
2013-06-24 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13 |
2013-03-20 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2013-03-20 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2013-03-20 | House | NR: HOLMES, GARA, EDGMON, AUSTERMAN |
2013-03-20 | House | DP: THOMPSON, T.WILSON, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, STOLTZE |
2013-03-20 | House | FIN RPT CS(TRA) 6DP 4NR 1AM |
2013-02-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2013-02-15 | House | FN1: (ADM) |
2013-02-15 | House | NR: KREISS-TOMKINS, ISAACSON, JOHNSON, P.WILSON |
2013-02-15 | House | DP: GATTIS, FEIGE, LYNN |
2013-02-15 | House | TRA RPT CS(TRA) 3DP 4NR |
2013-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS |
2013-01-16 | House | TRA, FIN |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13 |