AK HB186 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to police standards and amending the definition of 'police officer.'
Title
Definition Of Police Officer
Sponsors
Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Beth Kerttula [D] |
Sen. Mia Costello [R] | Rep. Kurt Olson [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/24/13 |
2013-09-10 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 61 SLA 13 |
2013-06-24 | House | 10:47 AM 6/21/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-11 | Senate | VERSION: HB 186 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-04-11 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-04-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 186 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2013-04-08 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL |
2013-04-08 | Senate | STA RPT 2DP 1NR |
2013-04-05 | Senate | STA |
2013-04-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-04 | House | VERSION: HB 186 |
2013-04-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, COSTELLO, OLSON, JOHNSON |
2013-04-04 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2013-04-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 186 |
2013-04-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2013-04-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-04-02 | House | NR: KELLER |
2013-04-02 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, ISAACSON, MILLETT, HUGHES, LYNN |
2013-04-02 | House | STA RPT 6DP 1NR |
2013-03-25 | House | STA |
2013-03-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |