AK HB176 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to experimental vehicles.
Title
Experimental Vehicle Plates
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Thompson [R] | Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] | Rep. Doug Isaacson [R] | Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] |
Rep. Eric Feige [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-03-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-27 | House | DP: LYNN, FEIGE, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, ISAACSON, P.WILSON |
2013-03-27 | House | TRA RPT CS(TRA) 6DP |
2013-03-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, GATTIS, FEIGE, LYNN |
2013-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON |
2013-03-18 | House | TRA, FIN |
2013-03-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |