AK HB174 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act raising the minimum age to purchase, sell, exchange, or possess tobacco, a product containing nicotine, or an electronic smoking product; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Min. Age To Possess Nicotine/ecig Product
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Knopp [R] | Rep. William Fields [D] | Rep. Sara Hannan [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Rep. Tiffany Zulkosky [D] | Rep. Grier Hopkins [D] | Rep. Lance Pruitt [R] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-27 | Senate | FIN |
2020-03-27 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-03-26 | House | VERSION: CSHB 174(CRA) |
2020-03-26 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2020-03-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, ZULKOSKY, HOPKINS, PRUITT, STORY |
2020-03-26 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2020-03-26 | House | PASSED Y27 N7 E4 A2 |
2020-03-26 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 174(CRA) |
2020-03-25 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/26 CALENDAR |
2020-03-25 | House | CRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2020-03-25 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-25 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | FN4: (REV) |
2020-03-18 | House | FN3: ZERO(LAW) |
2020-03-18 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2020-03-18 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2020-03-18 | House | NR: KOPP |
2020-03-18 | House | DNP: LEDOUX |
2020-03-18 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, STUTES, CLAMAN |
2020-03-18 | House | JUD RPT CS(CRA) NT 3DP 1DNP 1NR |
2020-03-11 | House | FN4: (REV) |
2020-03-11 | House | FN3: ZERO(LAW) |
2020-03-11 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2020-03-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2020-03-11 | House | DP: CLAMAN, JACKSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, HANNAN, DRUMMOND |
2020-03-11 | House | CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 5DP |
2020-02-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2019-05-15 | House | CRA, JUD |
2019-05-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |