AK HB17 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act adding to the powers and duties of the State Commission for Human Rights; and relating to and prohibiting discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.
Title
Discrimination: Gender Id.;sexual Orient.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2022-04-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2022-04-04 | House | DNP: EASTMAN, VANCE, KURKA |
2022-04-04 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, KREISS-TOMKINS, SNYDER, CLAMAN |
2022-04-04 | House | JUD RPT 4DP 3DNP |
2021-05-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2021-05-05 | House | STA REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER JUD |
2021-04-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER |
2021-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2021-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, SCHRAGE |
2021-02-18 | House | STA, JUD |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Advertising
Boards & Commissions
Business
Credit
Employment
Executive Branch
Families
Financial Institutions
Housing
Labor Unions
Leases
Loans
Municipalities
Property
Public Accommodations
Rights
Sales
School Districts
Wages
Boards & Commissions
Business
Credit
Employment
Executive Branch
Families
Financial Institutions
Housing
Labor Unions
Leases
Loans
Municipalities
Property
Public Accommodations
Rights
Sales
School Districts
Wages
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB17 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0017A.PDF |