AK HB165 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to hiring for positions in state service based on substitution of military work experience or training for civilian work experience or training requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel Act: Veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2017-04-11SenateSTA, FIN
2017-04-11SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-10HouseVERSION: HB 165
2017-04-10HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR, GUTTENBERG, JOSEPHSON, FANSLER, LEDOUX
2017-04-10HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
2017-04-10HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2017-04-10HouseCHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-04-10HousePASSED Y39 A1
2017-04-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 165
2017-04-10HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2017-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN, SPOHNHOLZ, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2017-04-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
2017-04-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2017
2017-04-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, EASTMAN
2017-04-07HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-04-07HouseDP: WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, BIRCH, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-04-07HouseSTA RPT 6DP
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-24HouseDP: SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER, PARISH, TUCK
2017-03-24HouseMLV RPT 4DP
2017-03-08HouseMLV, STA
2017-03-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback