AK HB162 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Southeast State Forest and relating to the Southeast State Forest; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Southeast State Forest
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 112 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:19 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 | |
2010-04-09 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2010-04-08 | VERSION: SCS HB 162(RES) | |
2010-04-08 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-08 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-08 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-08 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 162(RES) | |
2010-04-08 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-08 | RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-08 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-08 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | FN2: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-04-07 | NR: OLSON, ELLIS | |
2010-04-07 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS | |
2010-04-07 | FIN RPT SCS(RES) 4DP 2NR | |
2010-04-02 | FN2: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-04-02 | NR: FRENCH | |
2010-04-02 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, WAGONER, STEDMAN, STEVENS, HUGGINS | |
2010-04-02 | RES RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE | |
2010-01-20 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES | |
2009-04-16 | RES | |
2009-04-16 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-15 | VERSION: HB 162 | |
2009-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-15 | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 | |
2009-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 162 | |
2009-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-13 | FN1: ZERO(DNR) | |
2009-04-13 | NR: GARA, CRAWFORD, KELLY, SALMON, STOLTZE | |
2009-04-13 | DP: THOMAS, R.FOSTER, AUSTERMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, JOULE | |
2009-04-13 | FIN RPT 5DP 5NR | |
2009-04-10 | FN1: ZERO(DNR) | |
2009-04-10 | AM: KAWASAKI | |
2009-04-10 | DP: OLSON, EDGMON, TUCK, SEATON, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN | |
2009-04-10 | RES RPT 7DP 1AM | |
2009-03-02 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2009-03-02 | FN1: ZERO(DNR) | |
2009-03-02 | RES, FIN | |
2009-03-02 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |