AK HB157 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - TAKE FROM THE TABLE FAILED Y8 N11 A1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act requiring the disclosure of the identity of certain persons, groups, and nongroup entities that expend money in support of or in opposition to an application filed for a state referendum or recall election; relating to political contributions; relating to the location of offices for the Alaska Public Offices Commission and the locations at which certain statements and reports filed with the commission are made available; clarifying the limits on making, accepting, and reporting certain cash campaign contributions; relating to campaign finance reporting by certain groups; changing the date a legislator is required to report certain campaign contributions and expenditures; increasing the time the Alaska Public Offices Commission has to respond to a request for an advisory opinion; relating to penalties assessed for campaign finance violations; relating to complaints alleging campaign finance violations; repealing a reporting requirement for certain contributions; relating to contribution limits and recall campaigns; relating to campaign signs on private property; relating to the reporting of financial and business interests by municipal officers, former municipal officers, and candidates for municipal office; relating to reporting of contributions made after the date of the election by a candidate for the legislature; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apoc; Report Referenda/recall Contributor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Take from the Table (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 9 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 8 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18SenateTAKE FROM THE TABLE FAILED Y8 N11 A1
2022-05-18SenateBILL IS TABLED UC
2022-05-18SenateAM NO 7 ADOPTED UC
2022-05-18SenateAM NO 6 ADOPTED Y11 N8 A1
2022-05-18SenateAM NO 5 FAILED Y9 N10 A1
2022-05-18SenateAM NO 4 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2022-05-18Senate...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2022-05-18SenateAM NO 3 ADOPTED Y11 N9
2022-05-18SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N12
2022-05-18SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N13
2022-05-18SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMDS UC
2022-05-18SenateMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2022-05-18SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 157(FIN)
2022-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CAL
2022-05-17SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2022-05-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-05-17SenateRULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 5/17/2022
2022-05-17SenateFISCAL INFO FORTHCOMING
2022-05-18SenateFN3: (ADM)
2022-05-17SenateDNP: WILSON
2022-05-17SenateDP: WIELECHOWSKI
2022-05-17SenateNR: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON, VON IMHOF
2022-05-17SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 12
2022-05-17SenateFIN RPT SCS(FIN) 5NR 1DP 1DNP NEW TITLE
2022-04-12SenateFN2: (ADM)
2022-04-12SenateNR: HUGHES, KIEHL
2022-04-12SenateDP: HOLLAND, MYERS, SHOWER
2022-04-12SenateJUD RPT SCS(JUD) 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE
2022-03-25SenateFN2: (ADM)
2022-03-25SenateDP: SHOWER, HOLLAND, COSTELLO
2022-03-25SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 12
2022-03-25SenateSTA RPT 3DP
2022-01-21SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2022-01-18SenateSTA, JUD
2022-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-19HouseVERSION: CSHB 157(FIN)
2021-05-19HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2021-05-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STORY, TARR
2021-05-19HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-05-19HousePASSED Y36 N3 A1
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 157(FIN)
2021-05-19HouseLIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
2021-05-18HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, HOPKINS
2021-05-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
2021-05-18HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N36
2021-05-18HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
2021-05-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEBON
2021-05-14HouseFN1: (ADM)
2021-05-14HouseNR: ORTIZ, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, WOOL, FOSTER
2021-05-14HouseDP: LEBON, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK
2021-05-14HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 4DP 5NR
2021-05-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, MERRICK, LEBON
2021-04-28HouseFN1: (ADM)
2021-04-28HouseAM: CLAMAN, STORY, EASTMAN, KAUFMAN, VANCE
2021-04-28HouseNR: TARR
2021-04-28HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS
2021-04-28HouseSTA RPT 1DP 1NR 5AM
2021-04-28HouseFIN REPLACES JUD REFERRAL
2021-04-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2021-03-31HouseSTA, JUD
2021-03-31HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB157
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0157A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0157B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0157C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0157D.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/F/HB0157-1-2-042821-ADM-Y.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB157&Page=01189#1189
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB157&Page=01212#1212
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB157&Page=01153#AM1
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=HB157&Page=02978#AM1
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=HB157&Page=02978#AM2
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=HB157&Page=02978#AM3
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=HB157&Page=02978#AM5
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=HB157&Page=02978#AM6
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=HB157&Page=02998#2998

Bill Comments

feedback