AK HB153 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act expanding the Palmer Hay Flats State Game Refuge.
Title
Palmer Hay Flats Game Refuge
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Colver [R] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Cathy Tilton [R] |
Sen. Bill Stoltze [R] | Sen. Mia Costello [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-19 - House - House:
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
SCS CSHB 153(RES) Concur(Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/15 |
2015-05-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/19 CHAPTER 25 SLA 15 |
2015-05-12 | House | 9:04 AM 5/12/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-04-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2015-04-19 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E1 A1 |
2015-04-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2015-04-17 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2015-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 153(RES) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2015-04-17 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2015-04-16 | Senate | HUGGINS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2015-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 153(RES) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE |
2015-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/16 CALENDAR |
2015-04-15 | Senate | RES SCS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN |
2015-04-14 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, MICCICHE, STOLTZE |
2015-04-14 | Senate | RES RPT SCS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2015-04-09 | Senate | RES |
2015-04-09 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-08 | House | VERSION: CSHB 153(RES) |
2015-04-08 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, GARA |
2015-04-08 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2015-04-08 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 153(RES) |
2015-04-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-08 | House | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2015-03-31 | House | DP: HERRON, JOHNSON, SEATON, TARR, JOSEPHSON, OLSON, HAWKER, TALERICO |
2015-03-31 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) 8DP |
2015-03-20 | House | RES |
2015-03-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |