AK HB137 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - FN5: (DFG)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - FN5: (DFG)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the duties of the commissioner of fish and game; establishing an intensive management surcharge; providing for the repeal of the intensive management surcharge; establishing certain special hunting and fishing licenses and permits for residents with developmental disabilities; establishing a separate sustainable wildlife account in the fish and game fund; raising certain fees related to sport fishing, hunting, and trapping; relating to the fish and game fund; providing for the repeal of the sport fishing surcharge and sport fishing facility revenue bonds; relating to hunting and fishing by proxy; relating to fish and game conservation decals; raising the age at which a state resident is required to obtain a license for sport fishing, hunting, or trapping; relating to the Chitina dip net fishery; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hunt/fish/trap: Fees;licenses;exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Adopt the Conference Committee Report? Effective Dates (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House:
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHB 137(FIN) am S Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1? (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Letter of Intent (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Letter of Intent (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-11 - House - House:
CCS HB 137 Adopt(Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHB 137(FIN) am S Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1? (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Letter of Intent (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Letter of Intent (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | House | FN5: (DFG) |
2016-07-11 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 256 |
2016-07-11 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/28/16 |
2016-06-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2016-06-14 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 18 SLA 16 |
2016-05-27 | House | 4:36 PM 5/26/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-12 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CC RPT ADPTD Y14 N5 A1 CCS HB 137 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CC REPORT READ AND TAKEN UP |
2016-05-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2016-05-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-05-11 | House | CC RPT ADPTD Y35 N3 E2 CCS HB 137 |
2016-05-11 | House | CONSIDER CC REPORT |
2016-05-11 | House | FN5: (DFG) |
2016-05-11 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 22 |
2016-05-11 | House | CC REPORT: CCS HB 137 (RECEIVED 2:35 PM ON 5/10) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2016-05-05 | House | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2016-05-04 | Senate | GIESSEL (CHAIR), STOLTZE, STEVENS |
2016-05-04 | Senate | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2016-05-04 | Senate | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N18 E2 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | RECEDE MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2016-04-22 | Senate | RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2016-04-20 | House | TALERICO (CHAIR), NAGEAK, TARR |
2016-04-20 | House | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2016-04-20 | House | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N35 E4 A1 |
2016-04-20 | House | RESCIND ACTION CONCUR UC |
2016-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 N6 E1 |
2016-04-17 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2016-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 137(FIN) AM S |
2016-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2016-04-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N4 A1 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 137(FIN) AM S |
2016-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2016-04-17 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y14 N5 A1 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16 |
2016-04-16 | Senate | FN4: (DFG) |
2016-04-16 | Senate | NR: KELLY, OLSON |
2016-04-16 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN |
2016-04-16 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2016-04-01 | Senate | FN3: (DFG) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | AM: WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE, STOLTZE |
2016-03-30 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, STEDMAN |
2016-03-30 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, COGHILL |
2016-03-30 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 22 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | RES RPT SCS 2DP 2NR 3AM NEW TITLE |
2015-04-16 | Senate | RES, FIN |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-15 | House | VERSION: CSHB 137(FIN) AM |
2015-04-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-15 | House | ADOPTED HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT Y24 N12 A4 |
2015-04-15 | House | RESCIND ACTION INTENT LETTER UC |
2015-04-15 | House | TAKE UP RECON SAME DAY WITHDRAWN |
2015-04-15 | House | GARA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION WITHDRAWN |
2015-04-15 | House | FAILED HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT Y20 N20 |
2015-04-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-15 | House | PASSED Y33 N7 |
2015-04-15 | House | AM NO 3 (TITLE AM) ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-15 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-15 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N30 A1 |
2015-04-15 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-15 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC |
2015-04-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 137(FIN) |
2015-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR |
2015-04-14 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-13 | House | FN2: (DFG) |
2015-04-13 | House | NR: SADDLER, GARA, GUTTENBERG, EDGMON, NEUMAN |
2015-04-13 | House | DP: PRUITT, WILSON, GATTIS, MUNOZ, THOMPSON |
2015-04-13 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 5NR |
2015-04-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KELLER |
2015-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2015-03-27 | House | FN1: (DFG) |
2015-03-27 | House | AM: SEATON, TARR |
2015-03-27 | House | NR: HERRON, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON |
2015-03-27 | House | DP: OLSON, TALERICO |
2015-03-27 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 2DP 3NR 2AM |
2015-03-06 | House | RES, FIN |
2015-03-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |