AK HB136 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to motor vehicle franchises, motor vehicle dealers, motor vehicle manufacturers, and motor vehicle distributors.
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealer Franchises
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/30/18 |
2018-07-03 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/2 CHAPTER 50 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | 1:00 PM 6/25/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-20 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 136(TRA) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | BISHOP, MICCICHE, VON IMHOF, KELLY |
2018-04-14 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER, WILSON, COGHILL, EGAN, GARDNER, MACKINNON, GIESSEL |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 136(TRA) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-14 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | DP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN |
2018-04-14 | Senate | STA RPT 5DP |
2018-04-12 | Senate | STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | STA |
2018-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHB 136(TRA) |
2018-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-09 | House | JOSEPHSON, WOOL |
2018-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH, KOPP, KITO, TUCK, STUTES, KAWASAKI, |
2018-04-09 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N3 E1 |
2018-04-09 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2018-04-09 | House | CLAMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-04-09 | House | PASSED Y36 N3 E1 |
2018-04-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 136(TRA) |
2018-04-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-09 | House | TRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/09/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2018-04-09 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, JOSEPHSON, KNOPP, KITO |
2018-04-09 | House | L&C RPT CS(TRA) NT 5DP |
2018-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2018-03-30 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.TRA/LAW) |
2018-03-30 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, KOPP, WOOL |
2018-03-30 | House | TRA RPT CS(TRA) NT 5DP |
2017-02-20 | House | TRA, L&C |
2017-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Claims
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Data Processing
Finance
Funds
Investments
Motor Vehicles
Sales
Taxation
Claims
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Data Processing
Finance
Funds
Investments
Motor Vehicles
Sales
Taxation