AK HB133 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/28/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/28/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska savings program for eligible individuals; relating to education savings programs; relating to the Education Trust of Alaska; relating to the Alaska advance college tuition savings fund; relating to the Alaska education savings program for children; and relating to the Governor's Council on Disabilities and Special Education.
Title
Ak Ed Savings Programs/eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/28/22 |
2022-10-05 | House | LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 7/29 CHAPTER 47 SLA 22 |
2022-10-05 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-10-05 | House | 11:15 A.M. 7/7/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 133(L&C) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2022-05-17 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 133(L&C) |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CAL |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(UA) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, REVAK |
2022-05-11 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP |
2022-02-16 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(UA) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | DP: BEGICH, HUGHES |
2022-02-16 | Senate | NR: WILSON, REINBOLD, COSTELLO |
2022-02-16 | Senate | HSS RPT 3NR 2DP |
2021-05-10 | Senate | HSS, L&C |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-07 | House | VERSION: CSHB 133(L&C) |
2021-05-07 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-07 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2021-05-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 133(L&C) |
2021-05-06 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR |
2021-05-06 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-06 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | FN2: ZERO(UA) |
2021-04-26 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-04-26 | House | NR: KURKA |
2021-04-26 | House | DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER |
2021-04-26 | House | HSS RPT CS(L&C) 5DP 1NR |
2021-04-07 | House | HSS REPLACES FIN REFERRAL |
2021-03-25 | House | FN2: ZERO(UA) |
2021-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-03-25 | House | NR: KAUFMAN |
2021-03-25 | House | DP: SNYDER, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, NELSON, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS |
2021-03-25 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP 1NR |
2021-03-10 | House | L&C, FIN |
2021-03-10 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |