AK HB129 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to providing copies of a death certificate for a deceased veteran without charge.
Title
Deceased Veteran Death Certificate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12 | |
2012-06-19 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 69 SLA 12 | |
2012-06-14 | 3:35 PM 6/14/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-12 | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TUCK | |
2012-04-12 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 A2 V1 | |
2012-04-09 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2012-04-07 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 129(STA) | |
2012-04-07 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2012-04-07 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-07 | MEYER, ELLIS, MENARD, PASKVAN, EGAN, MCGUIRE, STEDMAN, THOMAS, STEVENS | |
2012-04-07 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAVIS, WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, KOOKESH, FRENCH, OLSON, WAGONER, | |
2012-04-07 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 129(STA) | |
2012-04-07 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-07 | STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-07 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-07 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | FN2: (DHS) | |
2012-04-04 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2012-04-04 | FIN RPT SCS (STA) 7DP | |
2012-03-28 | FN2: (DHS) | |
2012-03-28 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL | |
2012-03-28 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 26 | |
2012-03-28 | STA RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE | |
2011-04-14 | STA, FIN | |
2011-04-14 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-04-13 | VERSION: CSHB 129(FIN) | |
2011-04-13 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-04-13 | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG, KERTTULA, JOHNSON | |
2011-04-13 | PASSED Y39 A1 | |
2011-04-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 129(FIN) | |
2011-04-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-13 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-11 | FN1: (DHS) | |
2011-04-11 | DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2011-04-11 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, GARA, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, | |
2011-04-11 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 11DP | |
2011-04-09 | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, COSTELLO | |
2011-02-23 | FN1: (DHS) | |
2011-02-23 | NR: SADDLER | |
2011-02-23 | DP: GATTO, MILLER, THOMPSON | |
2011-02-23 | MLV RPT CS(MLV) 3DP 1NR | |
2011-01-28 | MLV, FIN | |
2011-01-28 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |