AK HB126 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Board of Professional Counselors; and relating to licensing of associate counselors.
Title
Associate And Professional Counselors
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Wright [R] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] | Rep. Sara Hannan [D] | Rep. Justin Ruffridge [R] |
Rep. Alyse Galvin [I] | Rep. Mike Prax [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-03-20 | Senate | FIN |
2024-03-20 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-03-18 | House | VERSION: HB 126 |
2024-03-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-03-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN, PRAX |
2024-03-18 | House | PASSED Y38 N1 E1 |
2024-03-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 126 |
2024-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RUFFRIDGE |
2024-03-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/18 CALENDAR |
2024-03-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2024-03-06 | House | FN7: (CED) |
2024-03-06 | House | FN6: ZERO(DOH) |
2024-03-06 | House | FN5: ZERO(DOH) |
2024-03-06 | House | FN4: ZERO(DOH) |
2024-03-06 | House | NR: CRONK, ORTIZ, JOSEPHSON |
2024-03-06 | House | DP: COULOMBE, HANNAN, GALVIN, STAPP, D.JOHNSON, FOSTER |
2024-03-06 | House | FIN RPT 6DP 3NR |
2024-01-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2023-05-03 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2023-05-03 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2023-05-03 | House | FN2: ZERO(DOH) |
2023-05-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(DOH) |
2023-05-03 | House | NR: FIELDS, CARRICK, SADDLER |
2023-05-03 | House | DP: WRIGHT, RUFFRIDGE, PRAX, SUMNER |
2023-05-03 | House | L&C RPT 4DP 3NR |
2023-03-22 | House | L&C |
2023-03-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |