AK HB124 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the recording of documents; relating to notaries and notarization, including notarial acts performed for remotely located individuals; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electronic Documents And Notarization
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Claman [D] | Rep. Sara Rasmussen [R] | Rep. Charles Kopp [R] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Rep. Adam Wool [D] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2020-05-18 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/29 CHAPTER 24 SLA 20 |
2020-05-18 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2020-05-18 | House | 10:00 A.M. 4/13/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-22 | Senate | VERSION: SSHB 124 |
2020-03-22 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2020-03-22 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2020-03-22 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2020-03-22 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 124 |
2020-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2020-03-22 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-22 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2020 |
2020-03-21 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2020-03-21 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2020-03-21 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, KIEHL |
2020-03-21 | Senate | JUD RPT 2DP 1NR |
2020-03-19 | Senate | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | JUD |
2020-03-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-03-17 | House | VERSION: SSHB 124 |
2020-03-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2020-03-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, STORY |
2020-03-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y37 E3 |
2020-03-17 | House | PASSED Y34 N3 E3 |
2020-03-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 124 |
2020-03-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2020-03-17 | 1916 | |
2020-03-17 | 1915 | |
2020-03-17 | 1913 | |
2020-03-17 | 1911 | |
2020-03-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-17 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2020-03-16 | House | HELD TO 3/17 CALENDAR |
2020-03-13 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/13 - ON 3/16 CALENDAR |
2020-03-13 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2020-03-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN |
2020-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2020-02-28 | House | DNP: EASTMAN |
2020-02-28 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, STUTES, KOPP, CLAMAN |
2020-02-28 | House | JUD RPT 4DP 1DNP |
2020-02-17 | House | JUD |
2020-02-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-02-17 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2019-04-08 | House | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) UC |
2019-04-05 | House | JUD, FIN |
2019-04-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |