AK HB12 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/8/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Protective Orders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective Orders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/8/19
2019-06-12HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 6/10 CHAPTER 7 SLA 19
2019-05-24House10:15 AM 5/24/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-03HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E2
2019-05-03HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2019-05-03HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2019-05-02SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 12(JUD)
2019-05-02SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2019-05-02SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2019-05-02SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BIRCH, BEGICH, STEVENS
2019-05-02SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 12(JUD)
2019-05-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-02SenateJUD SCS ADOPTED UC
2019-05-02SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-02SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2019
2019-04-29SenateGRAY-JACKSON, STEDMAN, BISHOP, GIESSEL
2019-04-29SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, REINBOLD, HUGHES, MICCICHE, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO
2019-04-29SenateFN3: ZERO(AJS)
2019-04-29SenateFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2019-04-29SenateFN1: ZERO(DPS)
2019-04-29SenateDP: HUGHES, KIEHL, MICCICHE
2019-04-29SenateJUD RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
2019-04-08SenateJUD
2019-04-08SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-05HouseVERSION: CSHB 12(JUD)
2019-04-05HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-04-05HouseRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2019-04-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JACKSON, HOPKINS, TARR, JOSEPHSON, TUCK
2019-04-03HousePRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2019-04-04HousePASSED Y38 E2
2019-04-03HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 12(JUD)
2019-04-03HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-04-03HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y5 N33 E2
2019-04-03HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y13 N25 E1 A1
2019-04-03HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y16 N23 E1
2019-04-03HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N23 E1
2019-04-03HouseAM NO 1 RULED OUT OF ORDER WITHDRAWN
2019-04-03HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2019-04-03HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-03HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2019
2019-03-29HouseFN3: ZERO(AJS)
2019-03-29HouseFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2019-03-29HouseFN1: ZERO(DPS)
2019-03-29HouseNR: EASTMAN
2019-03-29HouseDP: WOOL, LEDOUX, SHAW, KOPP, CLAMAN
2019-03-29HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
2019-03-08HouseFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2019-03-08HouseFN1: ZERO(DPS)
2019-03-08HouseDP: VANCE, LEDOUX, WOOL, SHAW, STORY, FIELDS, KREISS-TOMKINS
2019-03-08HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 7DP
2019-02-20HouseSTA, JUD
2019-02-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-02-20HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB12
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/HB0012A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/HB0012B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/HB0012C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/HB0012D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/HB0012Z.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0012A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0012C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0012D.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB12&Page=00447#0447
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB12&Page=00448#0448
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB12&Page=00449#0449
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB12&Page=00450#0450
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB12&Page=00452#0452
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=HB12&Page=01003#1003
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB12&Page=00799#0799

Bill Comments

feedback