AK HB118 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to state identifications and driver's licenses for persons in the custody of the Department of Corrections; relating to the duties of the commissioner of corrections; relating to living conditions for prisoners; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Expanding Prisoner Access To Computers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2022-02-08 | Senate | STA |
2022-02-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-02-04 | House | VERSION: CSHB 118(STA)(EFD AM) |
2022-02-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-02-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2022-02-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-02-04 | House | PASSED Y33 N1 E6 |
2022-02-04 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2022-02-04 | House | AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC |
2022-02-04 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N19 E6 |
2022-02-04 | House | AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED |
2022-02-04 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM NOS 2 & 3 UC |
2022-02-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 118(STA) |
2022-02-02 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 2/2 - ON 2/4 CALENDAR |
2022-01-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN, FIELDS, TARR, STORY, SCHRAGE |
2022-01-31 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/2 CALENDAR |
2022-01-31 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-01-31 | House | FN2: ZERO(COR)(SUBMITTED BY RULES) |
2022-01-31 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-01-31 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 1/31/2022 |
2021-05-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2021-05-14 | House | NR: EASTMAN |
2021-05-14 | House | DP: CLAMAN, STORY, KAUFMAN, VANCE, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-05-14 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 6DP 1NR |
2021-04-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER |
2021-03-01 | House | STA |
2021-03-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Corrections
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Education
Employment
Rights
Schools
Science & Technology
Vocational Training
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Education
Employment
Rights
Schools
Science & Technology
Vocational Training