AK HB111 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - RETURNED TO HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the practice of dental hygiene; relating to advanced practice permits for dental hygienists; relating to dental assistants; prohibiting unfair discrimination under group health insurance against a dental hygienist who holds an advanced practice permit; relating to medical assistance for dental hygiene services; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental Hygienist Advanced Prac Permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18SenateRETURNED TO HOUSE
2022-05-18SenateNOT TAKEN UP
2022-05-18SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 111(FIN)
2022-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CAL
2022-05-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-05-17SenateRULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 5/17/2022
2022-05-17SenateFN4: (DHS)
2022-05-17SenateFN3: (CED)
2022-05-17SenateDP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, VON IMHOF, WILSON
2022-05-17SenateNR: STEDMAN, OLSON
2022-05-17SenateFIN RPT SCS(L&C) 2NR 5DP SAME TITLE
2022-03-30SenateFN4: (DHS)
2022-03-30SenateFN3: (CED)
2022-03-30SenateDP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, MICCICHE
2022-03-30SenateL&C RPT SCS(L&C) 3DP SAME TITLE
2022-02-22SenateL&C, FIN
2022-02-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-02-17HouseVERSION: CSHB 111(FIN)
2022-02-17HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2022-02-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
2022-02-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2022-02-17HousePASSED Y34 N1 E5
2022-02-17HouseRETURN TO SECOND FAILED Y11 N23 E5 A1
2022-02-17HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 111(FIN)
2022-02-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2022-02-16HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/17 CALENDAR
2022-02-16HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2022-02-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-02-16HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2022
2022-02-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
2022-02-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, LEBON
2022-02-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STORY
2022-02-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
2022-02-04HouseFN4: (DHS)
2022-02-04HouseFN3: (CED)
2022-02-04HouseNR: MERRICK
2022-02-04HouseDP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, THOMPSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
2022-02-04HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 1NR
2021-04-05HouseFN2: (DHS)
2021-04-05HouseFN1: (CED)
2021-04-05HouseDP: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, NELSON, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
2021-04-05HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) 7DP
2021-02-24HouseL&C, FIN
2021-02-24HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback