AK HB108 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to concurrent vocational education, training, and on-the-job trade experience programs for students enrolled in public secondary schools; relating to child labor; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Concurrent Secondary & Trade School
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2022-04-04 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2022-04-04 | House | FN3: (EED) |
2022-04-04 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2022-04-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2022-04-04 | House | AM: HOPKINS, DRUMMOND, STORY |
2022-04-04 | House | DP: CRONK, GILLHAM, PRAX |
2022-04-04 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) 3DP 3AM |
2021-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2021-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER |
2021-03-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): VANCE |
2021-03-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S) REMOVED: MERRICK |
2021-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S) REMOVED: NELSON |
2021-03-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-03-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S) REMOVED: MCCABE, RAUSCHER |
2021-02-22 | House | EDC, L&C, FIN |
2021-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB108 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0108A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0108B.PDF |