AK HB108 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act adopting and relating to the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act; and relating to a specific electronic communications power that a principal may select for an agent under the statutory form power of attorney.
Title
Fiduciary Access To Digital Assets
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Claman [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] | Rep. Jason Grenn [I] | Rep. Dean Westlake [D] |
Rep. Justin Parish [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/17 |
2017-10-06 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/2 CHAPTER 18 SLA 17 |
2017-07-27 | House | 9:13 AM 7/17/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-04-21 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 108(JUD) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2017-04-12 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2017-04-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 108(JUD) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, KELLY, MEYER |
2017-04-11 | Senate | JUD RPT 5DP |
2017-04-06 | Senate | JUD |
2017-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-05 | House | VERSION: CSHB 108(JUD) |
2017-04-05 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH, JOSEPHSON, DRUMMOND |
2017-04-05 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2017-04-05 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 108(JUD) |
2017-04-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRENN, WESTLAKE |
2017-04-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR |
2017-04-03 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-31 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-03-31 | House | NR: EASTMAN, KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, REINBOLD |
2017-03-31 | House | DP: LEDOUX, CLAMAN |
2017-03-31 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 2DP 5NR |
2017-03-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-03-13 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KNOPP, KITO |
2017-03-13 | House | L&C RPT 7DP |
2017-02-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2017-02-08 | House | L&C, JUD |
2017-02-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Communications
Courts
Data Processing
Death
Estates
Internet
Privacy
Property
Science & Technology
Trusts
Uniform Acts
Wills
Courts
Data Processing
Death
Estates
Internet
Privacy
Property
Science & Technology
Trusts
Uniform Acts
Wills