AK HB100 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to teacher and public employee leave.
Title
Paid Family Leave
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Armstrong [D] | Rep. Calvin Schrage [N] | Rep. William Fields [D] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] |
Rep. Sara Hannan [D] | Rep. Alyse Galvin [I] | Rep. Rebecca Himschoot [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT |
2024-02-02 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-02 | House | FIN REPLACES EDC REFERRAL |
2024-02-02 | House | FN3: (ADM) |
2024-02-02 | House | FN2: ZERO(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2024-02-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2024-02-02 | House | NR: SADDLER, PRAX, RUFFRIDGE |
2024-02-02 | House | DP: CARRICK, FIELDS, WRIGHT, SUMNER |
2024-02-02 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 4DP 3NR |
2024-01-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN |
2024-01-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY, HANNAN |
2023-04-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2023-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2023-03-08 | House | L&C, EDC |
2023-03-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB100 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0100A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0100B.PDF |