AK HB1 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act stating a public policy that allows a person to accept or decline any offered mode of securing health care services.
Title
Policy For Securing Health Care Services
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Dick [R] | Rep. Carl Gatto [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] |
Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES | |
2011-04-12 | HSS, JUD | |
2011-04-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-04-11 | VERSION: CSHB 1(JUD) | |
2011-04-11 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-04-11 | COSPONSOR(S): DICK | |
2011-04-11 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N16 A1 | |
2011-04-11 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY Y35 N4 A1 | |
2011-04-11 | KAWASAKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2011-04-11 | PASSED Y24 N16 | |
2011-04-11 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 1(JUD) | |
2011-04-09 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON | |
2011-04-09 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR | |
2011-04-09 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-09 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-09 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | FN1: ZERO(DHS) | |
2011-04-07 | NR: GRUENBERG | |
2011-04-07 | DP: LYNN, KELLER, THOMPSON, PRUITT, GATTO | |
2011-04-07 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1NR | |
2011-03-16 | FN1: ZERO(DHS) | |
2011-03-16 | NR: SEATON, MILLER, HERRON | |
2011-03-16 | DP: DICK, KELLER | |
2011-03-16 | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 2DP 3NR | |
2011-01-18 | HSS, JUD | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |