US SB2912 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from gross income, for income tax purposes, federal public safety officer death benefits or amounts paid under a state program to surviving dependents of a public safety officer who died as the direct and proximate result of a personal injury sustained in the line of duty.
Title
Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-09-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-09-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5880; text as passed Senate: CR S5880) |
Same As/Similar To
SB2355 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2377 (Related) 2014-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5767 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2377 (Related) 2014-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5767 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Taxation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Taxation