US SB2355 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from gross income, for income tax purposes, federal public safety officer death benefits or amounts paid under a state program to surviving dependents of a public safety officer who died as the direct and proximate result of a personal injury sustained in the line of duty.
Title
Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2377 (Related) 2014-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2912 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Held at the desk.
HB5767 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2912 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Held at the desk.
HB5767 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Taxation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2355/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2355/BILLS-113s2355is.pdf |