CA AB2136 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11014.5, 11364, 11364.5, and 11364.7 of, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 11300) to Chapter 5 of Division 10 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: analyzing and testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (May 8). |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11014.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11300 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11364 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11364.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11364.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |