US SB2377 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from gross income, for income tax purposes, federal public safety officer death benefits or amounts paid under a state program to surviving dependents of a public safety officer who died as the direct and proximate result of a personal injury sustained in the line of duty. Makes this Act applicable to amounts received after December 31, 2011.
Title
Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2355 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2912 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Held at the desk.
HB5767 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2912 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Held at the desk.
HB5767 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Taxation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2377/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2377/BILLS-113s2377is.pdf |