WY SF0089 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - COW:Failed 9-15-7-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - COW:Failed 9-15-7-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; requiring health insurance and disability insurance plans to provide coverage for hearing aids and hearing aid professional services as specified; allowing for hearing aid coverage limitations; requiring that the cost of hearing aid coverage be equitable to other services provided under a health insurance plan; providing definitions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Insurance coverage for hearing aids.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Karlee Provenza [D] | Rep. Trey Sherwood [D] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - COW:Failed 9-15-7-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-01-25 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | Senate | COW:Failed 9-15-7-0-0 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-25 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | :Refer to S01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |