WY HB0116 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to concealed weapons; removing the state residency requirement for a person carrying a concealed firearm without a permit who meets the other statutory criteria; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed carry-residency requirement-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06 Assigned Chapter Number 113
2021-04-06 Governor Signed HEA No. 0070
2021-04-02SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0070
2021-04-01HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0070
2021-04-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0070
2021-04-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2021-03-31Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-30SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-25SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-03-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2021-03-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-17House3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0
2021-03-12House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-11HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-10HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-10HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2021-02-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-02-05 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback