WI SB752 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 26. a., 71.05 (6) (a) 26. b., 71.05 (6) (a) 26. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 32. a., 71.05 (6) (b) 32. ae., 71.05 (6) (b) 32. am., 71.07 (10) (a) 1., 71.07 (10) (a) 3., 71.07 (10) (b), 71.07 (10) (c) 2., 71.28 (10) (c) 2., 71.47 (10) (c) 2. and 224.50 (2) (a); and to create 71.05 (6) (b) 32. ap., 71.07 (10) (c) 3., 71.28 (10) (c) 3., 71.47 (10) (c) 3. and 71.98 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: modifying the tax treatment of college savings accounts and the employee college savings account contribution credit. (FE)
Title
Modifying the tax treatment of college savings accounts and the employee college savings account contribution credit. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Cabral-Guevara and Hesselbein |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Introduced |