WI AB98 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 350.136 of the statutes; Relating to: signs along snowmobile trails that advertise nearby businesses.
Title
Signs along snowmobile trails that advertise nearby businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-07 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-11-06 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2023-10-05 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2023-06-07 | House | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Pronschinske added as a coauthor |
2023-04-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Green |
2023-03-10 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduced |