WI AB919 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.255 (3) (eh) and 115.28 (66) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for the Nathan and Esther Pelz Holocaust Education Resource Center and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Funding for the Nathan and Esther Pelz Holocaust Education Resource Center and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-20 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2024-02-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-19 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2024-01-17 | House | Representatives Dittrich and Shelton added as coauthors |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer |
2024-01-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-11 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2024-01-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced |