WI AB912 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 202.12 (1) (b) 2g., 202.12 (1) (b) 2r., 202.12 (3) (b), 202.12 (3) (bm), 202.12 (3) (d) 1. and 202.12 (3) (d) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: financial statements of registered charitable organizations.
Title
Financial statements of registered charitable organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Published 3-22-2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 151 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2024-01-04 | House | Introduced |