WA SB5815 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revised for 1st Substitute: Adopting the physician assistant compact.Original: Concerning the physician assistant compact.
Title
Revised for 1st Substitute: Adopting the physician assistant compact.Original: Concerning the physician assistant compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-16 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-16 | House | PEW - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | New Code | See Bill Text |