WA SB5470 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning services provided by the office of homeless youth prevention and protection programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning services provided by the office of homeless youth prevention and protection programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-19SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2019-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-04SenateHSA - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-22SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.

Same As/Similar To

HB1657 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-25 - Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback