WA SB5270 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a nonoperating advisory board reporting to the state patrol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning a nonoperating advisory board reporting to the state patrol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-01SenateEffective date 6/9/2016.
2016-04-01SenateChapter 208, 2016 Laws.
2016-04-01SenateGovernor signed.
2016-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2016-03-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2016-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2016-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2016-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-02-29HousePlaced on second reading.
2016-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2016-02-23HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2016-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2016-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 11:00 AM.
2016-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2016-02-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2016-02-08SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2016-01-11SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-24HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2015-04-15HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-04-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2015-03-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2015-03-20HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2015-03-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
2015-03-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2015-03-05HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2015-03-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2015-03-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2015-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-02-10SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2015-02-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
2015-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2015-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB1311 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback